FELBRIDGE SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Association is to advance the education of the pupils in the school. In furtherance of this object the Association may: a)develop relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school b)engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of its pupils c)provide and assist in the provision of facilities for education in the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 November 1991: Standard registration
- FELBRIDGE PTA (Working name)
- FELDBRIDGE SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATE ELIZABETH WHITE | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kieron Dunnet | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Winsor | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Petch | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rodway | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.19k | £13.27k | £8.07k | £17.31k | £16.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.18k | £6.06k | £8.50k | £22.01k | £16.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH. SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE FELDBRIDGE COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Felbridge Primary School
2 Crawley Down Road
Felbridge
EAST GRINSTEAD
West Sussex
RH19 2NT
- Phone:
- 01342323413
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window