Financial history THE NATIONAL COMMUNITIES RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1005555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £383.82k £762.96k £158.85k £114.37k £183.23k
Total expenditure £3.40m £389.72k £163.05k £183.61k £213.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.07k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £42.07k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £58.85k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £645.72k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £16.31k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £389.72k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A