PAUL AND PHILOMENA CRONIN CHARITY FUND
Charity number: 1005591
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to registered charities in the fields of welfare, education and religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Total income: £80
Total expenditure: £50
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 04 November 1991: Standard registration
- 13 November 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £875 | £748 | £654 | £469 | £80 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £2.00k | £25 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 22 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 23 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 09 July 2017 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 29 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLOUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window