THE CLIFF RICHARD TENNIS DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 November 1991: Standard registration
- 22 February 2008: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 February 2008: Funds transferred to 298175 THE TENNIS FOUNDATION (LEGACY)
- CLIFF RICHARD TENNIS FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.25k | £184.56k | £320.92k | £164.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.90k | £207.72k | £210.01k | £88.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 14 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | 14 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 15 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 15 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 12 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 12 June 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 28 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 28 July 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH OCTOBER 1991 AND AS AMENDED 8 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
(A)THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM BY ORGANISING OR PROVIDING FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE THEM TO PLAY TENNIS AND THEREBY ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS; (B)THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED) OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window