THE FRIENDS OF FLETCHING PARISH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides funding for the maintenance and repair of the Fletching Parish Church. During the last two years we have funded Roof repairs and an Intruder alarm (to protect the lead roof).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 November 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Harding | Chair | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Sargent | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Forcier | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
LEYSA NOBLE | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Reynolds | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA ROTHERY | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cope | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Emma Myrtle | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MINCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
Andrew Shaw | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOANNE GREENISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67k | £2.79k | £8.71k | £9.61k | £6.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £90 | £19.29k | £791 | £10.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 November 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH. OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND FOR ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FLETCHING AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NO FURTHER OR OTHERWISE 1) TO PRESERVE,MAINTAIN,REPAIR,RENEW,IMPROVE,ENHANCE BEAUTIFY AND RESTORE AND WHERE APPROPRIATE TO REPLACE OR EXTEND THE STRUCTURE AND FABRIC,FURNITURE,STAINED GLASS,ORNAMENTS,MONUMENTS,FURNISHINGS,FIXTURES AND FITTINGS AND OTHER ARTIFACTS OF FLETCHING PARISH CHURCH,ITS CHURCHYARD AND GROUNDS,INCLUDING THE BELLS,ORGAN OR ANY OTHER MUSICAL INSTRUMENT OR MEANS OF MUSICAL OR VOCAL REPRODUCTION WHICH IS INTENDED FOR USE WITHIN THE SAID PARISH CHURCH 2) TO PROVIDE FOR ANY BUILDINGS OR OTHER STRUCTURES AND FACILITIES BY WAY OF ADDITIONS TO FLETCHING PARISH CHURCH,ITS CHURCHYARD AND GROUNDS,TO BE USED IN CONNECTION WITH THE ECCLESISTICAL CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FLETCHING,EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rosalynd
North Hall Lane
Splaynes Green
UCKFIELD
East Sussex
TN22 3TL
- Phone:
- 07824140738
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window