Accounts and annual returns OAK COTTAGE NURSERY

Charity Number: 1005700
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 20 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2007 13 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 13 May 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2006 17 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 15 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2005 27 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 24 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2004 15 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 15 November 2004 On Time