Financial history LYDNEY DIAL-A-RIDE AND COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1005716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £490.04k £447.72k £454.92k £632.33k £851.54k
Total expenditure £497.19k £461.83k £459.23k £602.55k £716.75k
Income from government contracts £182.48k £164.89k £259.74k £184.55k £218.25k
Income from government grants £96.60k £153.08k £105.59k £93.38k £165.08k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £4.21k £4.24k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £495.14k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £117.63k £847.14k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £4.24k
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £162 £154
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £15.20k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £589.55k £701.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £13.00k £15.60k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.50k £1.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0