THE WILDERNESS FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation develops understanding of the value of wilderness experience through trails and social programmes. Experience of the wild is used as a positive force for social and environmental sustainability, using pioneering models of work that engage vulnerable youth, as well as political and community decision makers. Leadership and advocacy development is key.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- South Africa
Governance
- 13 November 1991: Standard registration
- 27 November 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 27 November 2009: Funds transferred to 1118493 WILDERNESS FOUNDATION UK
- THE WILDERNESS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- WF-UK (Working name)
- THE WILDERNESS TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.68k | £146.24k | £449.75k | £378.28k | £198.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.55k | £143.69k | £446.14k | £333.46k | £295.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 30 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 30 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 30 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 30 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 30 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 30 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 30 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 30 June 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 27 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 27 July 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF WILDERNESS AND THE CONSERVATION THEREOF AND THE INTERRELATIONSHIP BETWEEN WILDERNESS AND THE ENVIRONMENT GENERALLY BY THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR DIRECT EXPERIENCE OF WILDERNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window