THE OXFORDSHIRE BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and furthering the craft of Beekeeping. Providing information, advice, talks to the public, including schools about bees, the environment and related issues. Giving help, encouraging good practice and supporting new beekeepers. Responding to the public where there is concern over bees, swarms and nests and bumblebees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 November 1991: Standard registration
- O B K A (Working name)
- OBKA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Horner | Chair | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Nigel Walker | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Patricia Parks | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ann Robinson | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Geoffrey Hart | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.12k | £15.17k | £14.74k | £15.40k | £5.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.48k | £13.49k | £13.34k | £16.61k | £5.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/03/1991 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/1999 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAR 2015 as amended on 25 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO IMPROVE THE PRACTICE AND SCIENCE OF APICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stonebrook House
Williamscot
BANBURY
Oxfordshire
OX17 1AB
- Phone:
- 07707147312
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window