MRS GODFREY-PAYTON TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have been in "run off" and have therefore been spending our capital, as permitted by our constitution. In 2015 we completed that process. The Dartington Hall Trust received ?23,151 for various projects and Sherston Parish Church was given ?40,000 to reorder their North Aisle. All the Trust funds have been distributed and the Trust has fulfilled its purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 14 November 1991: Standard registration
- 25 January 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.22k | £6.98k | £7.67k | £602 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.00k | £255.00k | £117.50k | £173.50k | £63.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 24 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 08 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 12 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 4TH FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT, AND IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AS TRUSTEES THINK PROPER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window