THE NORWICH CENTRE FOR PERSONAL PROFESSIONAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-The relief of persons who are in conditions of need, hardship, or distress; or who are aged, or sick by the provision of counselling services to individuals and groups -The advancement of public education especially education in counselling skills Through the following activities: -Individual counselling -Couple counselling -personal development workshops and groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 November 1991: Standard registration
- THE NORWICH CENTRE FOR PERSONAL AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Lilian Trevanion | Chair | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Thorne | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Joseph Kearney | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Francis Gibney | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jones | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.72k | £211.39k | £245.53k | £246.12k | £270.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.04k | £220.13k | £213.36k | £244.26k | £221.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH OCTOBER 1991, AMENDED 8TH OCTOBER 1993, AMENDED 10TH OCTOBER 1997 AND AS AMENDED 8TH JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING; PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND ALCOHOL ABUSE DEPRESSION EATING DISORDERS ANXIETY AND NEUROSES AND PHOBIAS, MARITAL AND FAMILY CONFLICTS, NERVOUS BREAK-DOWN AND ANY OTHER PROBLEMS AND ISSUES ADVERSELY AFFECTING INDIVIDUALS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS. 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION ESPECIALLY EDUCATION IN COUNSELLING SKILLS
Area of benefit
NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 EARLHAM ROAD
NORWICH
NR2 3RA
- Phone:
- 01603617709
- Email:
- admin@norwichcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window