Financial history Staffordshire Pathway Project

Charity Number: 1005976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £690.66k £903.41k £832.86k £986.11k £1.07m
Total expenditure £728.57k £780.29k £860.62k £945.66k £1.11m
Income from government contracts £16.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £96.81k £226.67k £245.65k £296.10k £353.46k
Income - Donations and legacies £78.51k £63.66k £94.38k £112.61k £167.31k
Income - Other trading activities £39.71k £27.57k £16.87k £22.98k £19.74k
Income - Charitable activities £571.84k £812.06k £721.58k £849.19k £880.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £608 £123 £30 £1.33k £4.05k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £724.41k £777.98k £857.29k £941.30k £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.16k £2.30k £3.33k £4.36k £8.44k
Expenditure - Governance £4.13k £4.77k £11.57k £10.53k £12.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0