Accounts and annual returns SHAH JALAL BENGALI SCHOOL AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1005985
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 February 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 February 2025 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2025 734 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2025 1099 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days