Financial history SHAH JALAL BENGALI SCHOOL AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1005985
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.19k £2.35k £5.31k £137 £19.42k
Total expenditure £9.11k £4.36k £3.90k £3.27k £19.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A