SHAH JALAL BENGALI SCHOOL AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bengali School and Islamic Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 November 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Mahruf Hussain | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dewan Abdullah Fahmi Choudhury | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Junab Ali | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jamal Hussain | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nazarul Islam | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.19k | £2.35k | £5.31k | £137 | £19.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.11k | £4.36k | £3.90k | £3.27k | £19.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2025 | 734 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2025 | 1099 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
A) ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM, PARTICULARY AMONGST PEOPLE OF BANGLADESHI ORIGIN. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM TO PERSONS OF BANGLADESHI ORIGIN. (C) TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR MEMBERS OF BANGLADESHI ORIGIN
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
AND ISLAMIC CENTRE
61 POPLAR ROAD
SPARKHILL
BIRMINGHAM
B11 1UH
- Phone:
- 07813120633
- Email:
- FREESEC@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window