MANCHESTER GLYNDEBOURNE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster opera in the North of England & support the Glyndebourne Touring Company & musical training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 November 1991: Standard registration
- 05 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.35k | £13.29k | £13.26k | £3.38k | £2.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.90k | £12.89k | £12.95k | £4.21k | £2.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 20 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE CHARITY GLYNDEBOURNE PRODUCTIONS LIMITED (243877).GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO GLYNDEBOURNE PRODUCTIONS LIMITED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window