FRIENDS OF K C S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to advance the education of pupils at King's College School Wimbledon and those pupils at other schools with which the school has a formal relationship, through events such as a Christmas Fair, Fireworks, Quiz Night, and Family Fun Sports events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merton
Governance
- 21 November 1991: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF KCS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shamik Ghosh | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Storey | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn O'Hare | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sayako Claude | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Whitaker | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Stockil | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Arney | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Tan | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Antony Berry | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Richardson | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Favre | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Cotton | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hamblin | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Parker MA | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Ted Lougher | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hunter | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prachi Prasad | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Gilligan | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.09k | £85.86k | £344.27k | £201.00k | £439.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.11k | £106.74k | £366.64k | £215.01k | £391.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 07 SEP 1991 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT KING’S COLLEGE SCHOOL WIMBLEDON AND THOSE PUPILS AT OTHER SCHOOLS IN THE MAINTAINED SECTOR AND OVERSEAS WITH WHICH THE SCHOOL HAS A FORMAL RELATIONSHIP.
Area of benefit
WIMBLEDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL
SOUTHSIDE COMMON
LONDON
SW19 4TT
- Phone:
- 07962 113236
- Email:
- sammy_sinclair@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window