Accounts and annual returns ASIAN MUSIC CIRCUIT LIMITED

Charity number: 1005993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2024 29 April 2025 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2023 29 April 2025 395 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2022 29 April 2025 761 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2021 29 April 2025 1126 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2020 13 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required