Governing document COMMUNITY OPTIONS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/08/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM MENTAL HEALTH DISORDERS OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL AND DOMICILIARY CARE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.