WENTWORTH GOLF AND TENNIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education & Training in Sports & Recreation for Young People
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 14 November 1991: Standard registration
- WENTWORTH GOLF AND TENNIS SCHOLARSHIPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Woraphanit Ruayrungruang | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Boyle | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Maclean | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Todd Patrick | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Leon | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Elsom | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MCLOUGHLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.16k | £29.26k | £30.52k | £20.70k | £29.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.62k | £26.00k | £25.73k | £25.24k | £29.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JULY 1991 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATE 27 MAY 1997 AND 19 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
(1)THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS,UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE UK TO PLAY GOLF,TENNIS OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSCIAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS (2)THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION EITHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
WENTWORTH CLUB
WENTWORTH DRIVE
VIRGINIA WATER
GU25 4LS
- Phone:
- 01344 842201
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window