THE HANDEL HOUSE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote knowledge, awareness, and enjoyment of Handel and his music to as wide a public audience as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£981,811
Donations and legacies | £771.39k | |
Charitable activities | £100.07k | |
Other trading activities | £36.99k | |
Investments | £73.36k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,191,219
Raising funds | £231.25k | |
Charitable activities | £959.97k | |
Other | £0 |
-£74,414 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £231.25k | |
Charitable expenditure | £959.97k |
People

8 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- HANDEL HOUSE MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE HANDEL HOUSE ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON PATRICK WEIL | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Viscountess Penelope Ann Cobham CBE | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Martin Donnelly | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Simon Richards Daniels | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Dr Peter Kerber | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Lucy Rhoda Le Fanu | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Lord Roderick Balfour | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Harry Alexander Bicket | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jane Anthony Ridley | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
William James Conner | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Victoria Rowland Broackes | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Michael Howard Ridley | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70m | £788.80k | £1.41m | £959.68k | £981.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £774.65k | £552.38k | £570.28k | £657.48k | £1.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.19m | £595.54k | £1.29m | £817.06k | £771.39k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £334.72k | £119.18k | £10.84k | £1.87k | £36.99k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £171.59k | £71.38k | £31.10k | £2.77k | £100.07k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.11k | £2.71k | £29.68k | £131.92k | £73.36k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £43.56k | £6.07k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £317.85k | £1.13m | £15.00k | £143.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £726.77k | £507.00k | £493.01k | £567.73k | £959.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £47.88k | £45.38k | £77.27k | £89.75k | £231.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.89k | £22.76k | £28.56k | £39.78k | £26.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £12.24k | £13.76k | £10.71k | £18.92k | £19.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.53m | £7.29m | £7.40m | £8.80m | £10.09m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.54m | £3.74m | £4.40m | £3.69m | £2.38m | |
|
Other assets | £343.47k | £486.80k | £1.25m | £1.03m | £331.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £168.69k | £50.44k | £99.67k | £582.23k | £157.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/02/2014 as amended on 19 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
The charity?s objects are, for the public benefit: 5.1. to promote, encourage, maintain, improve and advance education of the public in the life and works of George Frederic Handel and to establish and maintain the property located at 25 Brook Street, London W1 as a museum to house and preserve all articles having connection with the said George Frederic Handel; in particular by: i. the redevelopment, operation and maintenance of the property located at 25 Brook Street, London W1 known as the Handel House which was occupied by the composer George Frederic Handel from 1723 until his death in 1759; ii. to provide public access to the said premises for the purpose of promoting public awareness and appreciation of the historical nature and significance of the property; iii. to enhance public knowledge of Handel in general as well as his contributions to the field of classical music as a composer; and 5.2 to enhance public knowledge of the musical and cultural heritage of Brook Street, London W1 following Handel?s lifetime and in particular the music and culture of the 1960s (including the association with Jimi Hendrix) by maintaining all or part of 23 Brook Street to house and preserve the charity?s collections and other articles relating to such period and providing public access to such premises as an addition to the museum referred to in article 5.1 above.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Brook Street
London
W1K 4HB
- Phone:
- 02074951685
- Email:
- mail@handelhendrix.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window