THE HITACHI EUROPE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1006169
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE HITACHI CHARITABLE TRUST IS CURRENTLY SUSPENDED - The trustees will reconsider the suspension in April 2014. To help a variety of organisations and schools in the Royal Borough of Windsor and Maidenhead

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 1991: Standard registration
  • 22 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • HITACHI EUROPE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £296 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 20 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 25 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 01 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required