Accounts and annual returns THE WARREN MEAD SCHOOLS PARENT AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1006173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required