THE WILDLIFE FOR ALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage nature reserves and public education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
- South Africa
Governance
- 20 November 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN BRAUNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
Iain Scott | Trustee |
|
||||||
REBECCA W SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.68k | £19.77k | £37.21k | £53.59k | £48.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.46k | £24.19k | £23.82k | £42.54k | £15.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 February 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH. NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE OF THOSE ENDANGERED SPECIES WHICH ARE RARE OR THREATENED WITH EXTINCTION; AND (A)TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF ANY SUCH SPECIES IN ANY OF THEIR FORMS AND IN ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH SPECIES AND THE PUBLIC; AND (B)TO PROMOTE E DUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO RARE AND ENDANGERED SPECIES BY THE SUPPORT OF STUDIES AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oasis
Highbrook Lane
West Hoathly
EAST GRINSTEAD
RH19 4PL
- Phone:
- 07946 313718
- Email:
- wildlifeforall@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window