Trustees THE STOCKPORT YOUTH ORCHESTRA
Charity Number: 1006205

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary White | Chair | 23 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Karen Entwistle | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Thomason | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Freeman | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Peters | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Roy Burgess | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Hofton | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel McIlwraith | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alpaslan Amet | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.