The OutHouse

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Outhouse East supports the delivery of equality for lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender people of Essex and East Anglia. Offering services around information and support for LGBT people. Operating a counselling service and social groups. We also operate an LGBT community hub in Colchester, which has a cafe, meeting room and large library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,400 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 22 November 1991: Standard registration
- POLARITY (Working name)
- The OutHouse (Working name)
- COLCHESTER GAY SWITCHBOARD (Previous name)
- OUTHOUSE EAST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Mannix | Chair | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
LINDSEY ILSLEY | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Janu Miah | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
ELLIOT COUSINS | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Goodchild | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Faye Nora Edwards | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
James Silverstone | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Newell | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.43k | £264.80k | £660.67k | £257.94k | £280.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.24k | £138.43k | £173.03k | £275.39k | £274.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.17k | £40.11k | £22.83k | £23.83k | £1.40k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £38.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £473 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £621.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £24 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £172.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £65 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £17.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1992 AS AMENDED ON 08/08/1993 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2000 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2012 as amended on 12 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO SUPPORT PEOPLE WHO MAY BE EXPERIENCING MENTAL, EMOTIONAL OR OTHER CRISIS DUE TO THEIR HOMOSEXUAL, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER NATURE, OR WHO MAY BE IN DOUBT AS TO THEIR SEXUAL IDENTITY, AND TO WORK TO PREVENT THEIR ISOLATION AND HELP THEM REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL. B) TO SUPPORT PEOPLE WHO ARE AFFECTED OR INFECTED BY HIV OR AIDS. C) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT HOMOSEXUALITY, GENDER ISSUES, HIV OR AIDS. D) TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND INFORMATION FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES. E) TO OFFER SUPPORT TO CARERS, PARTNERS AND FAMILIES OF THE ABOVE. F) TO BE A POINT OF CONTACT FOR HOMOSEXUAL, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDERED PEOPLE AND ANYONE AFFECTED BY HIV OR AIDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE NORTH ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 EAST HILL
COLCHESTER
ESSEX
CO1 2QX
- Phone:
- 01206871394
- Email:
- info@theouthouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window