SALTASH BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a partially sighted and blind club that meet every week on a Tuesday. Our oldest member is 100 & our youngest 22. We are an active group of about 33 who play skittles occasionally, have weekly activity & socialising, open to anyone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 November 1991: Standard registration
- 10 February 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1108761 THE CORNWALL BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED ASSOCIATI...
- SALTASH BAPS (Working name)
- SALTASH VISUALLY IMPAIRED CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | £703 | £1.64k | £3.00k | £4.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.80k | £674 | £2.56k | £4.37k | £5.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 January 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND. MAY 1991, AMENDED 11TH. SEPTEMBER 1991, AS AMENDED 2 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
SALTASH AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window