HOME COUNTIES BOXER WELFARE

Charity number: 1006246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide a rescue service for boxer dogs throughout the UK. We rescue, rehabilitate and re-home dogs via kennels or foster homes where necessary , and also provide help and support for the welfare of boxers in general. We ensure the neutering of all our boxers if medically possible and provide back up for life.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £59,943
Total expenditure: £73,478

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donna Russell Chair 19 March 2017
None on record
Julie Lorne Semmence Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Angela Barber Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Tracey Lowes Trustee 24 March 2019
None on record
Eleanor Barton Trustee 26 March 2014
None on record
KAREN KERBY Trustee 26 March 2014
None on record
LORRAINE HARVEY Trustee 25 January 2012
None on record
ROSEMARY ANGELA EVELINE WESTBROOK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.21k £36.80k £27.74k £35.41k £59.94k
Total expenditure £33.34k £36.46k £26.88k £57.62k £73.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 Latimer
Stony Stratford
MILTON KEYNES
MK11 1HY
Phone:
07855 388993