Financial history FOLKESTONE PARKS AND PLEASURE GROUNDS CHARITY

Charity number: 1006288
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £754.00k £715.00k £740.00k £922.88k £923.76k
Total expenditure £732.00k £737.00k £771.00k £832.86k £907.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £581.00k £543.00k £549.00k £584.89k £18.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £91.00k £100.00k £145.00k £180.80k £172.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £82.00k £72.00k £46.00k £157.19k £218.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £514.42k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £688.00k £706.00k £723.00k £797.91k £907.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.00k £9.00k £7.00k £6.30k £8.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £44.00k £31.00k £48.00k £34.95k £0