Financial history ST MARK'S COLLEGE TRUST

Charity number: 1006316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.32k £14.84k £5.47k £10.48k £36.73k
Total expenditure £9.00k £15.34k £10.87k £25.05k £19.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A