Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WHITTINGTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1006357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 September 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 June 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required