CANTERBURY HOUSING ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1006386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF AN ADVICE SERVICE ON HOUSING ISSUES INCLUDING MATTERS OF HOUSING LAW

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £138,041
Total expenditure: £129,831

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • C H A C (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Teresa Pearce Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
John Andrew Wightman Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Slowe Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record
Tessa Louise O'Sullivan Trustee 20 November 2017
None on record
Vivien Ruth Gambling Trustee 16 November 2015
None on record
NICK JACKSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £149.36k £165.05k £111.61k £96.25k £138.04k
Total expenditure £116.85k £126.70k £118.74k £128.36k £129.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £13.80k N/A £57.86k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CANTERBURY HOUSING ADVICE CENTRE
2nd FLOOR
24 BURGATE
CANTERBURY
CT1 2HA
Phone:
01227762605