CHELTENHAM COLLEGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1006429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Trust is the advancement of education at Cheltenham College and Cheltenham College Preparatory School. The accounts incorporate a number of Bursary, Scholarship and Prize funds to sponsor pupils at Cheltenham College. The Trust also collects and administers funds raised for both enhancing existing and creating new facilities at the College.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £429,406
Total expenditure: £108,036

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM STRAKER-NESBIT Chair 13 March 2016
CHELTENHAM COLLEGE AND CHELTENHAM COLLEGE PREPARATORY SCHOOL
Received: On time
David Stewart Trustee 19 September 2020
CHELTONIAN ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
CHELTENHAM COLLEGE AND CHELTENHAM COLLEGE PREPARATORY SCHOOL
Received: On time
Tom O'Sullivan Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
NICOLA HUGGETT Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £128.23k £154.09k £106.76k £238.59k £429.41k
Total expenditure £192.81k £203.41k £142.02k £64.74k £108.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A BURSARY OR BURSARIES FOR BOYS TO ATTEND CHELTENHAM COLLEGE WHOSE MEANS OR WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS MEANS ARE INADEQUATE TO ENABLE THEM TO DO SO.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHELTENHAM, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Registration history
  • 01 June 1994 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
CHELTENHAM COLLEGE
BATH ROAD
CHELTENHAM
GL53 7LD
Phone:
01242705573