Accounts and annual returns DR SUSIL KUMAR AND JAMILA MITRA CHARITABLE TRUST(UK )

Charity number: 1006469
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2009 20 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 20 July 2010 165 days late
Annual return 05 April 2008 13 February 2009 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 13 February 2009 8 days late
Annual return 05 April 2007 01 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 01 February 2008 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2006 05 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 05 February 2007 On Time