Financial history DR SUSIL KUMAR AND JAMILA MITRA CHARITABLE TRUST(UK )

Charity Number: 1006469
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009
Total gross income £13.67k £16.18k £16.04k £18.23k £18.81k
Total expenditure £23.80k £34.51k £26.30k £22.85k £14.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A