THE FRIENDS OF RAKE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FoRSA exists for the benefit of everyone at Rake School, raising money and awareness to support and enhance the school experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 November 1991: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 December 2011: Re-registered
- F O R S A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Oakley | Chair | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay Barber | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Brown | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
EMMA MILLS | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.66k | £3.37k | £4.37k | £5.10k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.09k | £0 | £2.37k | £5.88k | £6.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH. FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
RAKE, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rake C of E Controlled First School
London Road
Rake
LISS
GU33 7JH
- Phone:
- 01730892126
- Email:
- office@rake.w-sussex.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window