RICHARD DEWING (RENTCHARGE)

Charity number: 1006600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides assistance to retired parishioners by making fuel and handicap grants annually

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,328
Total expenditure: £7,328

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CARBROOKE FUEL ALLOTMENT TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR DEREK WATTS Trustee
FUEL ALLOTMENT
Received: On time
JOHN MASON
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.42k £5.90k £6.44k £6.94k £7.33k
Total expenditure £5.42k £5.90k £6.44k £6.94k £7.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 March 2021 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Willow Corner
Carbrooke
THETFORD
IP25 6SS
Phone:
01953889010
Website:

No information available