KINSLEY CRAFT WORKSHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monday and Wednesday woodcraft sessions 1-40pm. Tuesday painting for pleasure 6-8pm. 3rd Thursday garden club 6pm. 2nd Saturday district council surgery 10-30am. "Hands On" for adults and children in various venues around the district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 05 December 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Northern | Chair | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Nunn | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vernon Harkin | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Evans | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Doyle | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ALAN PARKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.47k | £29.65k | £0 | £4.37k | £9.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.74k | £2.54k | £1.88k | £16.42k | £12.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 1991
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY PROMOTING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN WOODWORK AND CARPENTRY AND THE PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF CRAFTMANSHIP AND DESIGN (2) THE PURSUIT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN KINSLEY AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
KINSLEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Camargue
Charlestown
Ackworth
Pontefract
WF7 7DU
- Phone:
- 01977617434
- Email:
- lawrencedoyle@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window