WITNEY MUSEUM AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We collect, conserve and display items of local historical interest. We have a large collection in excess of 60,000 photographs. We are compiling a collection of local oral history tapes. The museum is visited by groups of school children and local groups eg. WI pensioners etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 December 1991: Standard registration
- 20 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1203635 WITNEY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM CIO
- WITNEY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM (Working name)
- WEST OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUM CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £17.73k | £3.81k | £6.70k | £7.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.13k | £7.72k | £18.45k | £7.08k | £12.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/08/2013
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM COMPRISING THE EXISTING COLLECTION TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER EXHIBITS OR ITEMS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION. (B)TO FORM ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT AND TO AID IN THE FORMATION ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE COMPANIES INSTITUTIONS ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS OR SOCIETIES FORMED FOR OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE.
Area of benefit
WEST OXFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window