Accounts and annual returns UMBRELLA

Charity number: 1006778
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 22 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 03 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 03 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 21 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 23 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 23 December 2009 On Time