WOLVERTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1006892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds to purchase items to support Wolverton School and the children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £5,845
Total expenditure: £3,661

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norman Stephens Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Emily Joanne Stephens Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
EMILY JAYNE MARY EVANS Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.06k £2.22k £2.79k £4.07k £5.85k
Total expenditure £2.74k £2.98k £2.82k £7.82k £3.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wolverton School
Wolverton Fields
Norton Lindsey
WARWICK
CV35 8JN
Phone:
01926842214
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available