Mind in Tower Hamlets, Newham and Redbridge

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mind in Tower Hamlets and Newham provide a range of community and in-patient services for people who are experiencing mental health and emotional issues living in the London boroughs of Tower Hamlets and Newham. We work with people through one to one support and group work, counselling, advice and advocacy, employment and training as well as complementary therapies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,656,443
Donations and legacies | £10.80k | |
Charitable activities | £3.57m | |
Other trading activities | £23.33k | |
Investments | £25.39k | |
Other | £22.52k |
Total expenditure:
£3,503,004
Raising funds | £652 | |
Charitable activities | £3.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,303,000 from 20 government contract(s) and £38,939 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £652 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.50m | |
Retained for future use | £153.44k |
People

82 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 06 March 1992: Standard registration
- MIND IN TOWER HAMLETS (Previous name)
- MIND IN TOWER HAMLETS AND NEWHAM (Previous name)
- Mind in Tower Hamlets, Newham and Redbridge (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Martin | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elise Hensiek | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hema Parmar | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna Abeyie | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Precious Sithole | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dipti Shah | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Kyne | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Asif Dhanani | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dimitrios Goumenos | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Mclean | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Oldfield | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04m | £2.49m | £3.05m | £3.31m | £3.66m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99m | £2.41m | £2.88m | £3.38m | £3.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.15m | £2.81m | £3.01m | £3.30m | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00m | N/A | £232.41k | N/A | £38.94k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £25.39k | £30.53k | £27.42k | £6.10k | £10.80k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.74k | £0 | £0 | £6.58k | £23.33k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.00m | £2.45m | £3.00m | £3.25m | £3.57m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £842 | £201 | £67 | £3.63k | £25.39k | |
|
Income - Other | £15.29k | £10.75k | £14.23k | £37.01k | £22.52k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.99m | £2.41m | £2.88m | £3.38m | £3.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £1.14k | £4.61k | £652 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £862 | £3.52k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £380.88k | £388.62k | £381.26k | £324.34k | £263.10k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £371.55k | £431.66k | £790.66k | £766.28k | £999.14k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£80.14k | -£13.55k | -£6.16k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £277.83k | £185.88k | £319.40k | £322.07k | £346.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 01 Apr 2019 as amended on 13 Apr 2022 as amended on 07 Mar 2023 as amended on 08 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
4. TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS, WITH DUE CONSIDERATION TO GENDER, RACE SEXUALITY, AGE, CULTURE AND DISABILITY, REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS (HAVERING, BARKING AND DAGENHAM), IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF MIND.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS, LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mind in Tower Hamlets
Newham and Redbridge
13 Whitethorn Street
London
- Phone:
- 02075101081
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window