SUTTON OPPORTUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fully inclusive pre-school for children aged 2-5 years, with 50% of places for children with additional educational, medical and/or social needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 29 January 1992: Standard registration
- 30 May 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 30 May 2012: Funds transferred to 1132408 SUTTON OPPORTUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
- SUTTON OPPORTUNITY PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- SUTTON OPPORTUNITY GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.24k | £45.28k | £40.69k | £55.91k | £62.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.99k | £48.63k | £43.28k | £50.64k | £56.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 03 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 24 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 23 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 11 November 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1990, AMENDED 18 NOVEMBER 1991 AND 30 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window