Financial history ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1007182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £207.94k £151.77k £197.73k £227.70k £325.31k
Total expenditure £155.55k £155.95k £168.86k £176.48k £236.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.96k N/A N/A N/A