ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The animal rescue charity provides sanctuary (safe haven) throughout the UK for all animals whether domesticated or wild. Without exception, the prevention of suffering and preservation of life is paramount. The ultimate objective is to re-home or re-habilitate. Operates save a dog (SAD) campaign to rescue dogs facing euthanasia from Uk dog pounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 January 1992: Standard registration
- ANIMAL RESCUE CHARITY (ARC) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Prior | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Johnson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thompson | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Perry | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA HUNT | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET GWENDOLINE ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA PIGGOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.94k | £151.77k | £197.73k | £227.70k | £325.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.55k | £155.95k | £168.86k | £176.48k | £236.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH. NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO RESCUE AND PROVIDE CARE AND SHELTER FOR ANIMALS THAT ARE UNWANTED NEGLECTED ABANDONED OR ILL TREATED AND TO FIND PERMANENT HOMES FOR SUCH ANIMALS WHEREVER POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Animal Rescue Charity
Foxdells
Farnham Road
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 1JB
- Phone:
- 01279501547
- Email:
- Support@animalrescue.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window