Accounts and annual returns BLACK TORRINGTON C E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1007184
Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 January 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required