INSULATION ENVIRONMENTAL TRAINING TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to promote and advance training and employment in the thermal insulation industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £71,400 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Cockin | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abby Jay Naylor | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jean Bowes | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GRAHAM SOADY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.91k | £129.20k | £817 | £120.49k | £80.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.01k | £83.33k | £35.14k | £102.25k | £45.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £86.40k | £129.00k | N/A | £118.80k | £71.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2012
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN THE HOT COLD CHILLED AND CYROGENIC INSULATION BUSINESS OR IN WORK OF A SIMILAR OR ALLIED NATURE INCLUDING THE STRIPPING AND REPLACEMENT OF INSULATION MATERIALS OF ALL KINDS AND OTHER RELATED INDUSTRIES BOTH IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE. (B)TO PROMOTE USEFUL RESEARCH INTO ANY MATTERS RELATING TO THE TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT IN THE THERMAL INSULATION AND OTHER RELATED INDUSTRIES AFORESAID AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE ANY USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TICA HOUSE
34 ALLINGTON WAY
YARM ROAD BUSINESS PARK
DARLINGTON
COUNTY DURHAM
DL1 4QB
- Phone:
- 01325 466704
- Email:
- enquiries@tica-acad.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window