THE ZIPPER CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heart Support Group, affiliated to British Heart Foundation, giving information and support to those about to have, or who have had, heart and/or circulation-related surgery. Publishes magazines quarterly and holds quarterly meetings. Operates mainly in the Greater Manchester and Cheshire areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Warrington
Governance
- 07 January 1992: Standard registration
- 21 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £2.90k | £2.81k | £5.44k | £3.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.04k | £2.99k | £3.10k | £3.50k | £3.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 21 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | 08 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | 14 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1991 AS AMENDED 11 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE OPEN HEART SURGERY PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES OF THE AMI ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL CHEADLE
Area of benefit
ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL CHEADLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window