ST SEBASTIAN'S PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1007237
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sports nights. BBQ. Ladies nights. Bingo.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2012
Total income: £2,800
Total expenditure: £2,139
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Liverpool City
Governance
Registration history:
- 08 January 1992: Standard registration
- 12 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- ST SEBASTIANS PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.16k | £3.27k | £4.18k | £4.84k | £2.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.65k | £2.65k | £3.50k | £1.20k | £2.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window