Financial history THE ERIC BENNETT MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1007301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.27k £3.47k £3.91k £4.29k £4.42k
Total expenditure £560 £11.32k £603 £72 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A